ROCHFORD AND RAYLEIGH CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of the Bureau is the provision of free, confidential, independent and impartial advice, information and counsel for members of the public, ensuring that individuals do not suffer through lack of knowledge or an inability to express their needs effectively.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Total income includes £85,729 from 2 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 19 October 2000: Standard registration
- 06 March 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 06 March 2020: Funds transferred to 1113231 Citizens Advice Braintree & South Essex Limited
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £231.00k | £151.71k | £94.32k | £114.81k | £105.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £238.21k | £187.53k | £107.14k | £108.52k | £115.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £60.00k | £0 | £0 | £80.14k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £79.74k | £76.06k | £1.80k | £85.73k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 27 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 27 September 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 01 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 01 October 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 02 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 03 October 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 24 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 29 July 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 31ST MAY 2000, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS INCORPORATED 15TH SEPTEMBER 2000 AND 8 JULY 2009. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE LOCAL AUTHORITY DISTRICT OF ROCHFORD AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Area of benefit
THE AREA OF ROCHFORD DISTRICT COUNCIL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window