CHICHESTER CATHEDRAL CHORISTERS' ASSOCIATION'S SCHOLARSHIP TRUST

Charity Number: 1090178
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Support for educational fees for choristers of Chichester Cathedral.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £30,104
Total expenditure: £21,525

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 January 2002: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CCCA TRUST FOR CHORISTERS' SCHOLARSHIPS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Howard Lawrence Jenner Trustee 17 November 2020
None on record
John Francis Attwater Trustee 24 September 2016
FAIRSTEAD HOUSE SCHOOL TRUST LTD
Received: On time
THE KING'S SCHOOL WORCESTER DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
THE OUSELEY CHURCH MUSIC TRUST
Received: On time
Canon Nason David Trustee 01 January 2016
None on record
ANDREW TIMOTHY PORTER MA, MSC Trustee
None on record
TIM INGRAM HILL Trustee
THE INGRAM HILL FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £24.78k £20.89k £23.41k £31.33k £30.10k
Total expenditure £18.99k £16.15k £19.96k £20.63k £21.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 16 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 16 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 04 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 04 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
81 ALWYN ROAD
MAIDENHEAD
SL6 5EJ
Phone:
01628788757
Website:

No information available