KASHMIRI AND AFRICAN DEAF CHILDREN'S' TRUST

Charity number: 1086367
Charity reporting is up to date (34 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provide grants to the running of a deaf school in Kashmir and raising funds to set up an audiology clinic.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £39,233
Total expenditure: £18,425

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • India
  • Pakistan
  • The Gambia

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 April 2001: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • KADECT (Working name)
  • KASHMIR DEAF CHILDREN'S TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MOHAMMED AKHTAR Chair
None on record
MOHAMMED AFZAL Trustee
ISLAMIC CENTRE ST ALBANS (HERTS)
Received: On time
ST ALBANS PAKISTAN WELFARE AND CULTURAL ASSOCIATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 1565 days
AFSANA AKHTAR Trustee
None on record
GERDI QUIST Trustee
None on record
CHRIS BUMSTEAD Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £87.09k £75.66k £75.97k £58.95k £39.23k
Total expenditure £99.63k £51.35k £56.04k £47.10k £18.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £20.00k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 04 December 2024 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 04 December 2024 34 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 December 2023 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 December 2023 61 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 30 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 December 2021 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

06 December 2021 36 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 November 2020 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 07 November 2020 7 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
17 BLANDFORD ROAD
ST. ALBANS
AL1 4JP
Phone:
01727838518