SCALE - SOUND CREATION ADVANCING LEARNING AND EDUCATION (FOR SPECIAL NEEDS)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE SUPPORT SEVERE AND PROFOUND LEARNING DIFFICULTIES CHILDREN AND ADULTS HAVING EXTRA HEALTH NEEDS: SENSORY/PHYSICAL AND CHALLENGING BEHAVIOUR AND THE ELDERLY WITH DEMENTIA. SOUND/MUSIC/COLOUR/LIGHT ENABLES THEM TO HAVE CONTROL OVER AND IMPACT ON THEIR ENVIRONMENT. BY DOING SO OUR BENEFICIARIES ARE ABLE TO BE PART OF THE WIDER COMMUNITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 July 2001: Standard registration
- 15 February 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 15 February 2020: Funds transferred to 1091628 Community Foundation for Staffordshire and Shropsh...
- SCALE (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2014 | 31/10/2015 | 31/10/2016 | 31/10/2017 | 31/10/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.00k | £34.46k | £30.32k | £13.95k | £9.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.66k | £34.37k | £30.23k | £13.86k | £9.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.16k | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2018 | 03 December 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2017 | 19 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2017 | 03 December 2018 | 94 days late | |
Annual return | 31 October 2016 | 13 December 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2016 | 13 December 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21 JUNE 2001 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 26 SEPT 2001
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS WITH SPECIAL NEEDS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SOUND AND MUSIC TECHNOLOGY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window