THE WHITWORTH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust raises funds to support residents of Whitworth House, a hostel for homeless and vulnerable young women aged 16-25. It also raises money to help vulnerable and homeless women in Cambridge more generally, including women of any stage of life, with children or without, and offers assistance and support to women in finding and securing affordable accommodation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 19 April 2002: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDS OF WHITWORTH HOUSE (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosemary Anne Juhl | Chair | 04 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Catherine Mary Horsewood-Groom | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sarah Atkins | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mary Ward | Trustee | 08 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Richard Cragg | Trustee | 14 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jo Wibberley | Trustee | 22 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
David Whitworth | Trustee | 22 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.66k | £4.70k | £2.87k | £4.42k | £3.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.46k | £9.29k | £7.49k | £8.18k | £1.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 18 August 2024 | 234 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 06 February 2021 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 MAR 2002 AS AMENDED ON 19 MAR 2003 AS AMENDED ON 20 MAR 2006 AS AMENDED ON 06 APR 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE THE RELIEF OF POVERTY; MORE PARTICULARLY AMONGST WOMEN NORMALLY RESIDENT IN THE CITY AND COUNTY OF CAMBRIDGE; (1) NEEDING SUPPORTED RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION FOR YOUNG WOMEN SUCH AS THAT PROVIDED BY WHITWORTH HOUSE: (2) NEEDING OTHER ASSISTANCE AND SUPPORT IN FINDING AND SECURING SECURE AND AFFORDABLE ACCOMMODATION.
Area of benefit
CAMBRIDGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 HERTFORD STREET
CAMBRIDGE
CB4 3AE
- Phone:
- 01223748872
- Email:
- whitworthtrust@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window