NORTHUMBERLAND MASONIC CHARITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1094245
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

NMCA is primarily a fundraising appeal fund for all freemasons in the Masonic Province of Northumberland. Each year one or more masonic provinces are nominated by The Grand Charity of the United Grand Lodge of England to host a Festival in aid of a designated charity. The Province of Northumberland was nominated to host a Festival in 2020 in aid of the Royal Masonic Benevolent Institution.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £209,713
Total expenditure: £287,992

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • North Tyneside
  • Northumberland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 October 2002: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE NMCA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN JAMES CRAIGS Chair 29 September 2014
None on record
Paul Richard Winship Trustee 30 November 2023
RICHARD HENRY HOLMES MASONIC BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
John Nigel Bruce Trustee 21 September 2022
RICHARD HENRY HOLMES MASONIC BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
TLC APPEAL NORTHUMBERLAND
Received: On time
KEVIN PETER STANNARD Trustee 01 August 2020
RICHARD HENRY HOLMES MASONIC BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
STUART CAIRNS Trustee 26 September 2018
RICHARD HENRY HOLMES MASONIC BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
TLC APPEAL NORTHUMBERLAND
Received: On time
NORTHUMBERLAND MARK BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
Peter Maurice Smith Trustee 29 September 2016
None on record
IAN MICHAEL GILBERG FCIS Trustee 29 September 2014
NORTHERN STEEL NETWORK
Received: On time
NORTH TYNESIDE STEELBAND
Received: On time
RICHARD HENRY HOLMES MASONIC BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
MATTHEW DAVID EDWARD AULD Trustee 07 December 2012
None on record
GARNET DUFF BURTON Trustee
None on record
COLIN HUME Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £319.42k £228.86k £242.28k £319.55k £209.71k
Total expenditure £411.23k £283.62k £178.15k £290.61k £287.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 08 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 08 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 24 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 24 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 30 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 06 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 06 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 24 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 24 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Prov Grand Lodge of Northumberland
17 Lansdowne Terrace
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE3 1HP
Phone:
01912136990