HINDU NARI SANGH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Multicultural work, the idea being community cohesion. Collaborative work with local cultural groups and with Customs House Trust (theatre and cinema) South Shields. We also run classical dance (Bharatnatyam) classes and Bollywood dance classes at the Customs House Mill Dam South Shields.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Gateshead
- Hartlepool
- Middlesbrough
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 23 July 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gitapriya Balasubramanian | Trustee | 15 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Aditi Ray | Trustee | 13 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Savitri Sharma | Trustee | 13 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Smitha Vandiyil | Trustee | 13 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Deepashree Thumbarathy | Trustee | 30 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Mahua Gangopadhyay | Trustee | 30 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Elle Violet Wendy Crompton | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
SHILA LASKAR | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Elaine Crompton | Trustee | 18 September 2016 |
|
|||||||||
Dianne Burton | Trustee | 18 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
FAY CUNNINGHAM | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
Dr SHOBHA SRIVASTAVA | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.07k | £7.90k | £13.15k | £4.03k | £6.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.96k | £5.83k | £7.85k | £7.66k | £9.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 March 2024 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 5 SEPTEMBER 1993, AS AMENDED ON 2 MARCH 2002
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE HINDU RELIGION THROUGH THE CELEBRATION OF THE HINDU RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS. 2.THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONGST HINDU WOMEN IN THE NORTH EAST THROUGH ENCOURAGING THEIR PARTICIPATION IN EDUCATIONAL COURSES AND TRAINING. 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONGST THE PUBLIC IN THE NORTH EAST IN THE HISTORY, CULTURE AND TRADITIONS OF THE HINDU RELIGION THROUGH THEIR PARTICIPATION IN ARTS AND CULTURAL EVENTS. 4. TO HAVE EDUCATIONAL AND CULTURAL ACTIVITIES FOR THE CHILDREN OF THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
157 Heaton Gardens
SOUTH SHIELDS
Tyne And Wear
NE34 9UA
- Phone:
- 01914546414
- Email:
- kgmcindia@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window