THE BURDETT TRUST FOR NURSING

Charity number: 1089849
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Grant Making Charity

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Jamaica
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland
  • Sierra Leone
  • South Africa
  • Switzerland
  • Uganda

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 December 2001: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • THE BURDETT TRUST FOR NURSES (Previous name)
  • THE BURDETT TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALAN GIBBS Chair
JUNIUS S MORGAN BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
David Julian Martin Smith Trustee 14 December 2023
None on record
Dame Donna Kinnair Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Janice Stevens CBE Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Rachael Marguerite Corser Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
AUDREY ARDERN-JONES Trustee 28 June 2018
None on record
ANDREW GIBBS Trustee 08 December 2016
None on record
Professor DAVID THOMAS SINES CBE PHD Trustee 16 July 2014
JCCP
Received: On time
Evy Piers George Hambro Trustee 13 November 2013
HAMBRO FAMILY FOUNDATION
Recently registered
ANDREW EVERARD MARTIN SMITH Trustee
THE GRESHAM'S FOUNDATION
Received: On time
JUNIUS S MORGAN BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
DAME CHRISTINE BEASLEY DBE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.08m £1.27m £840.95k £851.37k £1.29m
Total expenditure £5.72m £5.64m £4.09m £5.32m £3.96m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £523.61k £56.73k £3.30k £44.25k £29.13k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.56m £1.21m £837.39k £807.12k £1.26m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £24.11k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.45m £4.64m £3.11m £4.22m £3.81m
Expenditure - Raising funds £261.48k £266.82k £201.47k £180.46k £156.01k
Expenditure - Governance £116.04k £83.07k £115.91k £37.70k £39.63k
Expenditure - Grants institution £3.93m £4.25m £3.00m £4.18m £2.93m
Expenditure - Investment management £261.48k £266.82k £201.47k £180.46k £156.01k
Expenditure - Other £0 £738.83k £780.45k £917.78k £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £88.18m £84.06m £92.86m £83.01m £87.97m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £3.90m £3.82m £3.53m £4.02m £4.47m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 17 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 17 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 November 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 01 November 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 17 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 December 2020 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 08 December 2020 38 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
30 GRESHAM STREET
LONDON
EC2V 7QN
Phone:
0207 319 5510