COLCHESTER AVENUE ALLOTMENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
provision of allotment facilities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cardiff
Governance
- 14 May 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIAN GOSS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
John Sanders | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|||||
ROGER ARTHUR STUART WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.30k | £15.14k | £14.05k | £14.17k | £15.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.53k | £9.48k | £10.93k | £9.55k | £13.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £176 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.25k | £11.91k | £10.82k | £9.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 APRIL 2001 AS AMENDED 14 MARCH 2002.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN HORTICULTURE IN PARTICULAR IN THE PENYLAN WARD OF THE CITY AND COUNTY BOROUGH OF CARDIFF IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ALLOTMENTS.
Area of benefit
THOSE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES IN THE PENYLAN WARD OF THE CITY AND BOROUGH OF CARDIFF.
Contact information
- Address:
-
48
Bronwydd Avenue
Cardiff
Cardiff
Caerdydd
CF23 5JQ
- Phone:
- 02920486821
- Email:
- admin@caaa.wales
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window