THE ROYAL MONMOUTHSHIRE ROYAL ENGINEERS (MILITIA) CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1093105
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Supporting the wider activities of the Regiment known as The Royal Monmouthshire Royal Engineers (Milita). Assisting with recruiting, retention and welfare of serving and formerly serving volunteers and their families. Ownership of Regimental Silver and chattels, also Regimental War Memorial at Monmouth. Assistance to Regimental Museum.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £4,284
Total expenditure: £835

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 July 2002: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Captain David Bell Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record
MAJOR JEREMY WILLIAM GRANVILLE SMITH TD Trustee
None on record
LIEUTENANT COLONEL DAVID WASHINGTON TD Trustee
None on record
Lieutenant Colonel Andrew Simon Tuggey CBE Trustee
UK COMMUNITY FOUNDATIONS
Received: On time
OLD REDINGENSIANS ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Received: On time
THE COMMUNITY FOUNDATION IN WALES
Received: On time
COLONEL IAN CHRISTOPHER THOMPSON TD Trustee
ROYAL MONMOUTHSHIRE ROYAL ENGINEERS (MILITIA) REGIMENTAL MUSEUM
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £2.22k £8.93k £2.27k £2.41k £4.28k
Total expenditure £1.35k £8.49k £6.25k £2.60k £835
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 07 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 16 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 28 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 29 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 03 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
R Mon RE (M) Charitable Trust
Regimental HQ
The Castle
MONMOUTH
Gwent
NP25 3BS
Phone:
07803 403138
Website:

No information available