GUILDFORD CATHEDRAL MUSIC DEVELOPMENT FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1093933
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity exists solely to raise and apply funds for the provision and development of the musical foundation of Guildford Cathedral, Surrey, U.K.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £279,389
Total expenditure: £123,351

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 September 2002: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID THOMAS WATTS Chair
None on record
The Very Reverend Robert Gerard Cooper Trustee 13 February 2025
None on record
Rev RACHEL ELIZABETH YOUNG Trustee 13 October 2022
CHAPTER OF THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF THE HOLY SPIRIT, GUILDFORD
Recently registered
WILLIAM PAUL CLARK SAVAGE Trustee 11 July 2019
None on record
STEPHEN CLEMENT BOURNE Trustee 01 February 2013
None on record
PROFESSOR SEBASTIAN FORBES Trustee
None on record
RICHARD JOHN STEVENS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £18.91k £20.57k £10.76k £21.43k £279.39k
Total expenditure £75.52k £62.57k £91.54k £51.78k £123.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 07 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 07 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
CATHEDRAL OFFICE
STAG HILL
GUILDFORD
SURREY
GU2 7UP
Phone:
01483547887