THE YELLOW HEART TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our objective is the relief of distress relating to complex trauma and/or addiction.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout London
Governance
- 16 August 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP WILLIAM ROBINSON | Chair | 19 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Collins | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Penelope Cain | Trustee | 28 June 2019 |
|
|||||
JENNIFER ANN PHILPOTT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.04k | £6.23k | £11.47k | £6.00k | £13.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.52k | £7.21k | £12.52k | £8.84k | £10.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 22 May 2023 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | Download Open in new window | |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 15 March 2022 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON THE 16 APRIL 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 19 JULY 2002.
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE:- THE RELIEF OF THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL SICKNESS AND DISTRESS OF PERSONS IN NEED BY REASON OF ADDICTION TO DRUGS OR ALCOHOL, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
55 Renfields
HAYWARDS HEATH
West Sussex
RH16 4UG
- Phone:
- 07853528220
- Email:
- info@yht.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window