TYNE THEATRE AND OPERA HOUSE PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To acquire, restore and preserve for the benefit of the public at large the Grade One Listed Building known as The Tyne Theatre and Opera House.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,723,519
Donations and legacies | £192.03k | |
Charitable activities | £1.53m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £1.82k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,691,125
Raising funds | £1.32m | |
Charitable activities | £369.86k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.32m | |
Charitable expenditure | £369.86k | |
Retained for future use | £32.39k |
People

115 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 03 September 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Gordon Kelsall | Trustee | 03 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Chloe Maria Squires | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Rebecca Jay Graham | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Rajinder Singh JP | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Dr Kathleen Fadden | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Sonia Maria Hernandez Laffey | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Rosalind Dougal | Trustee | 14 March 2017 |
|
|||||||||
John Richardson | Trustee | 14 March 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
MICHAEL JOHN WILMOT | Trustee | 20 February 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
James Lloyd | Trustee | 22 January 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
Alan Paul Butland | Trustee | 02 February 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
IAN RICHARD HARRIS MBE FRICS | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
BARRY NEIL SPEKER OBE DL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £243.25k | £65.21k | £912.42k | £1.53m | £1.72m | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.90k | £156.67k | £762.32k | £1.24m | £1.69m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £117.70k | £191.33k | £192.03k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £1.34m | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £1.53m | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £60 | £461 | £1.82k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £794.66k | £2.00k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £693.06k | £968.20k | £369.86k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £69.26k | £269.68k | £1.32m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £21.88k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | £626.66k | £689.93k | £761.78k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £1 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | £638.42k | £996.31k | £943.41k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | £213.44k | £341.89k | £344.55k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 April 2023 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 April 2023 | 65 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 9 NOVEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 30 JANUARY 2002, 19 SEPTEMBER 2002, 12 OCTOBER 2005 AND 3 MAY 2007 as amended on 12 May 2022
Charitable objects
1 TO ACQUIRE, RESTORE AND PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE THE GRADE ONE LISTED BUILDING KNOWN AS THE TYNE THEATRE AND OPERA HOUSE; 2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE DRAMATIC ARTS BY THE PRESENTATION AND PRODUCTION OF PLAYS AND OTHER EXPRESSIONS OF DRAMA INCLUDING THE COMMISSIONING OF NEW WORKS AND THE MOUNTING OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCES AND THE MOUNTING OF CLASSES, EXHIBITIONS AND DEMONSTRATIONS OF DRAMATIC ARTS AND THEATRE TECHNOLOGY; 3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THEATRE TECHNOLOGY BY THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND EXHIBITION OF MACHINERY AND TECHNOLOGY OF THE PERFORMING ARTS AND THE INTERPRETATION OF SUCH ARTEFACTS AND THEIR HISTORICAL CONTEXT; 4 THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE ARTS INCLUDING MUSIC AND MUSIC THEATRE, DRAMA, DECORATIVE AND VISUAL ARTS, DANCE, BALLET, CIRCUS, MUSIC HALL AND COMEDY VARIETY PERFORMANCE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tyne Theatre and Opera House
117 Westgate Road
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE1 4AG
- Phone:
- 0191 243 1171
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window