YORKSHIRE FILM ARCHIVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FIND, PRESERVE AND PROVIDE ACCESS TO MOVING IMAGE MADE IN OR ABOUT YORKSHIRE AND THE NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
126 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 19 August 2002: Standard registration
- 07 November 2012: Funds received from 1119435 NORTHERN REGION FILM AND TELEVISION ARCHIVE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLARE MORROW | Chair | 28 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Matthew Christopher Lee | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Giles Bridge | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Kathryn Sara Penny | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Sally Anne Joynson | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Robert Leslie Hickey | Trustee | 12 December 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Graeme Thompson | Trustee | 19 April 2017 |
|
|||||||
DALE GRAYSON | Trustee | 05 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £425.57k | £445.53k | £337.62k | £439.15k | £434.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £418.17k | £360.03k | £352.13k | £426.19k | £482.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £23.42k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM & ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 08 JULY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26 JUN 2012
Charitable objects
3.1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY, CUSTOMS, CULTURE AND ARTISTIC AND ECOLOGICAL HERITAGE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTAINING AN ARCHIVE OF MOTION PICTURES RELATING TO THE SUBJECT WHETHER FILM, VIDEOTAPE OR OTHER MEDIUM 3.2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTISTIC, EDUCATIONAL AND HISTORICAL SEQUENCES OF SUCH MOTION PICTURES AND OF ANY KIND OF LIBRARY DOCUMENTARY OD PRODUCTION MATERIAL RELATED TO SUCH MOTION PICTURESS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, YORKSHIRE, CLEVELAND, HUMBERSIDE, NORTH, EAST AND WEST RIDINGS
Contact information
- Address:
-
YORK ST. JOHN UNIVERSITY
LORD MAYORS WALK
YORK
YO31 7EX
- Phone:
- 01904876550
- Email:
- yfa@yorksj.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window