HEATHS COUNTRYSIDE CORRIDOR
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This community project relies on local interest and management and provides wildlife sites and a natural screen alongside the High Speed 1 railway in Charing Heath and Lenham Heath. HCC has planted trees, provided wildlife sites, footpaths and regular events, for the local community to enjoy, and provided a schools education pack, to increase children's understanding of the countryside.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 16 April 2003: Standard registration
- 18 September 2019: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 18 September 2019: Funds transferred to 239992 KENT WILDLIFE TRUST
- HCC (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.30k | £21.98k | £6.07k | £10.11k | £7.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.42k | £19.96k | £7.54k | £8.07k | £9.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.15k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 22 June 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 09 July 2017 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 AUGUST 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 21 MARCH 2003 & 9TH DECEMBER 2003.
Charitable objects
TO CONSERVE AND ENHANCE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE NATURAL BEAUTY AND HABITATS OF THE GRENSAND BELT AREA AROUND CHARING AND LENHAM AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO THE NATURAL AND PHYSICAL ENVIRONMENT AND ITS CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION ("THE OBJECTS").
Area of benefit
CHARING, LENHAM, KENT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window