ELMWOOD COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
LOCAL GROUP WORKING WITH FAMILIES IN BROAD GREEN, CROYDON. TUESDAY DROP-IN 11AM TO 2PM CLASSES IN ICT, YOGA, DRESS MAKING, KNITTING, MENDHI AND OTHER CRAFTS, ENGLISH AND LITERACY SKILLS AS MANY MEMBERS DO NOT HAVE ENGLISH AS THEIR FIRST LANGUAGE, VISITS TO SEA-SIDE, MUSEUMS AND SEASONAL CELEBRATIONS. SCHOOL HOLIDAY ACTIVITIES WITH EXTRA CLASSES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Croydon
- Merton
- Sutton
Governance
- 11 September 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Farzana Ahmed | Chair | 26 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Samina Syed | Trustee | 26 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
MRS M KHAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS S QADEER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS Z MEHBOOB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GHAZALA MIRZA | Trustee |
|
||||||
NINA BARAKZAI | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.18k | £958 | £8.70k | £6.00k | £2.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.18k | £1.52k | £3.57k | £6.59k | £7.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.31k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 AUGUST 2003.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR FAMILIES AND THEIR CHILDREN RESIDENT IN THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF CROYDON, MERTON AND SUTTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE FOR THE SAID FAMILIES AND THEIR CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF CROYDON, MERTON AND SUTTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
113 Dennett Road
CROYDON
CR0 3JH
- Phone:
- 02082519251
- Email:
- info@elmwoodcommunity.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window