UK ALEXANDER VON HUMBOLDT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1100683
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Annual meeting with programme of speakers in sciences and arts. Irregular further meetings. Encouragement to young scholars to study in Germany. Help with German scholars visiting UK and funded by the Humboldt Foundation

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £1,327
Total expenditure: £309

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 November 2003: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Robert Vilain Chair 16 September 2022
None on record
Prof. Gennady Mishuris Trustee 13 September 2024
None on record
Prof. Belen Olmos Giupponi Trustee 13 September 2024
None on record
Dr Paras Anand Trustee 13 September 2024
None on record
Prof. Justin Lamonte Tumlinson Trustee 13 September 2024
None on record
Prof. Timothy Michael Devinney Trustee 13 September 2024
None on record
Dr Shannon Anthony Bonke Trustee 13 September 2024
None on record
Dr ANDREW LAURENCE ALDERSEY JOHNSON Trustee 21 July 2022
DERBY CHAMBER MUSIC SOCIETY
Received: On time
Dr Ingo Dierking Trustee 21 March 2022
None on record
Dr Feng Wang Trustee 12 March 2022
None on record
Dr Roy Ruddle Trustee 01 October 2018
2ND OTLEY SCOUT GROUP
Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days
John Baines Trustee 10 December 2017
None on record
Professor Rainer Cramer Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
DR PEG KATRITZKY PHD Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £1.13k £80 £0 £1.23k £1.33k
Total expenditure £1.52k £0 £0 £1.09k £309
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 25 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 25 November 2024 209 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 14 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 26 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 25 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
CAVENDISH LABORATORY
UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE
19 JJ THOMSON AVENUE
CAMBRIDGE
CB3 0HE
Phone:
01223337380
Email:
No information available