ESCAPE COMMUNITY ART IN ACTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Improve the quality of life and promote equality through social inclusion & integration of beneficiaries in need by reason of their age, health or disabilities, in particular but not exclusively by providing or assisting with the provision of creative arts and heritage-led educational and recreational activities, helping to reduce isolation & improve physical & mental health & well-being.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £5,000 from 1 government contract(s) and £38,518 from 9 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
72 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 29 May 2003: Standard registration
- ESCAPE (Working name)
- Escape Arts (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas McCarthy | Trustee | 22 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Davies | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Warner | Trustee | 25 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stewart William Bell | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Louise Suzanne Schmitz | Trustee | 24 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Taylor | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Sharon Marie Walpole | Trustee | 06 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £211.83k | £248.09k | £303.10k | £408.92k | £368.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £211.00k | £217.59k | £334.00k | £385.28k | £336.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £36.10k | £43.85k | £107.06k | £170.65k | £38.52k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 14 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 14 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 07 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 16 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 16 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 MAY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 30 APRIL 2003 as amended on 25 Jan 2021 as amended on 27 Jan 2022 as amended on 24 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
1. To improve quality of life and promote equality through the social inclusion and integration of beneficiaries who are in need by reason of their age, health inequalities, mental health conditions, physical or learning disabilities, in particular but not exclusively by providing or assisting with the provision of creative arts and heritage-led educational and recreational activities, helping to reduce isolation and improve physical and mental health and wellbeing. 2. To promote any charitable purposes for the benefit of the community in the county of Warwickshire and surrounding area (hereinafter called ‘the area of benefit’)
Area of benefit
STRATFORD UPON AVON AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Slaughterhouse
Sheep Street
STRATFORD-UPON-AVON
CV37 6EE
- Phone:
- 01789 532110
- Email:
- info@escapearts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window