THE FRIENDS OF AUDLEY END

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to promote the preservation, protection and improvement of Audley End House and its gardens, grounds and all facilities therein for the education and benefit of the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Essex
Governance
- 06 April 2004: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH KIRKPATRICK | Chair |
|
||||||
TIM TURNER | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOHN EDWARD JUXON PICKTHORN | Trustee | 23 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Dr Clive William Glazebrook | Trustee | 11 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ANTHONY BARTON | Trustee | 10 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
MRS KATHRYN HARRIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
David Broomfield | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.79k | £36.29k | £20.55k | £20.51k | £17.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.35k | £14.31k | £17.77k | £16.03k | £15.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 MARCH 2004
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF AUDLEY END HOUSE AND ITS GARDENS, GROUNDS AND ALL FACILITIES THEREIN FOR THE EDUCATION AND BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Westfields
SAFFRON WALDEN
Essex
CB11 3DZ
- Phone:
- 01799522711
- Email:
- sarahkirk1558@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window