THE FRIENDS OF HALIFAX MINSTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide funds for the maintenance repair and conservation of the fabric of the Minster Church of St.John the Baptist Halifax
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Calderdale
Governance
- 30 September 2004: Standard registration
- THE SOCIETY OF FRIENDS OF THE HALIFAX PARISH CHURCH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Revd Canon Hilary John Barber | Chair |
|
||||||||
Diane Cothey | Trustee | 03 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Angela Forsey | Trustee | 03 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
DAVID GLOVER | Trustee | 03 October 2021 |
|
|||||||
Jennifer Finder | Trustee | 08 June 2016 |
|
|
||||||
SUSAN KATHRYN KING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Sheila Marjorie Stoppard | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.27k | £1.45k | £2.49k | £3.11k | £54.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.51k | £0 | £3.54k | £468 | £42.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 SEPTEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED 24 JANUARY 2010.
Charitable objects
THE CONSERVATION, REPAIR, PAINTING, HEATING, LIGHTING AND THE INSURANCE OF THE MINSTER CHURCH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST HALIFAX AND THE MEMORIALS, ORGAN, WOODWORK, GLASS AND REQUISITES FOR WORSHIP THEREIN AND THE CHURCHYARD (SUBJECT TO THE LIABILITY OF THE LOCAL AUTHORITY IN RESPECT OF CLOSED CHURCHYARDS).
Area of benefit
MINSTER CHURCH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST, HALIFAX
Contact information
- Address:
-
72 SPRINGWOOD DRIVE
HALIFAX
HX3 0TQ
- Phone:
- 01422368495
- Website:
-
halifaxminster.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window