WISBECH COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community facilities provided within the Community Centre
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 13 November 2003: Standard registration
- OASIS VILLAGE COMUNITY & CHILDRENS CENTRE (Working name)
- THE VILLAGE CHILDREN'S CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Terry John Jordan | Chair | 07 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rima Simkute | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Lee Burton | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Lucie Clara Foice-Beard | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa-Jayne Bannister | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carl Edward Suckling | Trustee | 03 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER MARK STEPHEN GOAD | Trustee | 27 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Jason Melvyn Hubbard | Trustee | 02 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Heather Jane Thirlwell | Trustee | 07 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
MRS PAT BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEVE CAWTHORNE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £127.59k | £141.75k | £113.42k | £110.79k | £134.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £138.77k | £126.27k | £144.17k | £143.85k | £155.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.21k | £48.60k | £21.34k | £11.93k | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/11/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/10/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/11/2011 as amended on 11 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
1 TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WISBECH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE THE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. 2 TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME IN THE FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY
Area of benefit
WISBECH
Contact information
- Address:
-
OASIS COMMUNITY & CHILDRENS CNTR
ST. MICHAELS AVENUE
WISBECH
CAMBRIDGESHIRE
PE13 3NR
- Phone:
- 01945461526
- Email:
- contact@theoasiscentre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window