FRAUD ADVISORY PANEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advising governments, charities, public authorities, professionals, businesses, and individuals on the prevention, detection, investigation, prosecution and deterrence of fraud through education, training and other awareness-raising activities, research into the nature, extent and causes of fraud, and public policy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£538,870
Donations and legacies | £473.78k | |
Charitable activities | £53.75k | |
Other trading activities | £9.61k | |
Investments | £1.73k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£177,770
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £177.77k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £177.77k | |
Retained for future use | £361.10k |
People

15 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 05 April 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sir David John Mark Green CB QC | Chair | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Maria Cronin | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Hough | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Iain David Wright | Trustee | 03 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Michael Levi | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Adrian Anderson | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Liyun Adrienne Fitzgerald | Trustee | 12 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
David John Steven Bacon | Trustee | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Sexton | Trustee | 03 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Brendan Weekes | Trustee | 03 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Arun Kumar Singh Chauhan | Trustee | 05 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Patrick James Rappo | Trustee | 05 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Raymond MacAulay Holmes | Trustee | 05 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
OLIVER JOHN SHAW | Trustee | 02 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
FRANCES COULSON | Trustee | 02 July 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £356.46k | £73.41k | £113.80k | £160.05k | £538.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £211.38k | £149.09k | £172.52k | £205.27k | £177.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £35.55k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £473.78k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £9.61k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £53.75k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.73k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £177.77k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £177.77k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £509.61k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £38.64k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/11/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/03/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/09/2007 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 30/06/2011 as amended on 22 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY'S OBJECT IS THE PROTECTION OF LIFE AND PROPERTY BY THE PREVENTION, DETECTION, INVESTIGATION, PROSECUTION AND DETERRENCE OF FRAUD, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF:- 3.1 RESEARCH INTO THE NATURE, EXTENT AND CAUSES OF FRAUD AND INTO THE MEANS, SYSTEMS AND TECHNIQUES OF PREVENTING, DETECTING, INVESTIGATING, PROSECUTING AND DETERRING THE SAME, MAKING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC; 3.2 EDUCATION OF THOSE ACTUALLY OR POTENTIALLY AFFECTED BY FRAUD CONCERNING THE FOREGOING AND IN RELATION TO REGULATORY AND LEGAL ASPECTS OF THE SAME; AND 3.3 COLLABORATION WITH AND ADVICE TO GOVERNMENTS, PUBLIC AUTHORITIES, PROFESSIONAL AND OTHER BODIES, COMPANIES, FIRMS AND INDIVIDUALS CONCERNING THE DEVELOPMENT OF GENERAL SYSTEMS, STANDARDS, POLICIES, REGULATIONS AND LAWS WITH A VIEW TO THE PREVENTION, DETECTION, INVESTIGATION, PROSECUTION AND DETERRENCE OF FRAUD; AND TO FURTHER THE ABOVE OBJECT EXCLUSIVELY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF CHARITY OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
FRAUD ADVISORY PANEL
CHARTERED ACCOUNTANTS HALL
MOORGATE PLACE
LONDON
EC2R 6EA
- Phone:
- 02079208721
- Email:
- info@fraudadvisorypanel.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window