WORKING TOGETHER
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a mainly voluntary organisation. We run a cafe and drop-in centre staffed partly by our learning disabled members. We run a work skills development programme and a healthy options programme that provided work experience and activities for our learning disabled young people and adults. Sessions have included arts, crafts, drama, sports, horticulture, nutrition, ITC skills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Herefordshire
- Shropshire
Governance
- 14 September 2004: Standard registration
- 28 October 2014: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 28 October 2014: Funds transferred to 1147358 WORKING TOGETHER (LUDLOW) LTD
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2007 | 30/09/2008 | 30/09/2009 | 30/09/2010 | 30/09/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.85k | £46.23k | £39.83k | £60.04k | £51.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.04k | £37.14k | £43.20k | £48.12k | £45.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2011 | 12 March 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2011 | 28 May 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 AUGUST 2004 AS AMENDED 16 NOVEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND TRAINING, AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE SHROPSHIRE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window