GEFEN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1104831
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To pursue the objects of the charity with all the resources available to the charity.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024

Total income: £385,435
Total expenditure: £360,170

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 July 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ARNOLD HENRY Trustee
NER FOUNDATION
Received: On time
DAF HAYOMI
Received: On time
THE CENTRE FOR SPECIALIST EDUCATIONAL ASSISTANCE
Received: On time
YESHIVAH L'ZEIRIM MANCHESTER CHARITY TRUST
Received: On time
THE DELMAN CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
BEIS HATALMUD MANCHESTER
Received: On time
THE A I W CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
YEMIN CHARITABLE TRUST LTD
Received: On time
HENRY NEUMANN Trustee
None on record
ALIZA NEUMANN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £384.40k £337.09k £300.05k £425.58k £385.44k
Total expenditure £264.36k £340.33k £474.93k £358.53k £360.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 28 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 28 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 31 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 31 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 28 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 28 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 28 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 28 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 04 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 04 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
6 BRANTWOOD ROAD
SALFORD
M7 4FL
Phone:
0161 772 0099
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available