TYNE RIVERS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Tyne Rivers Trust has a unique role as guardian of the River Tyne Catchment, overseeing the continuing conservation and regeneration of the river from the impacts of its industrial past. The Trust provides education programmes and promotes understanding of the river to all ages, alongside the science-based, practical projects we develop and implement to improve the river system.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income:
£1,244,707
Donations and legacies | £281.95k | |
Charitable activities | £907.53k | |
Other trading activities | £42.09k | |
Investments | £2.27k | |
Other | £10.87k |
Total expenditure:
£1,206,915
Raising funds | £753 | |
Charitable activities | £1.18m | |
Other | £28.81k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £815,789 from 17 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £29.57k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.18m | |
Retained for future use | £37.79k |
People

10 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
88 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cumbria
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 20 December 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Charles Richard Kirk | Chair | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Dawn Legget | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Hollingsworth | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Anne Marie Gardener | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Theia Batchelor | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Brown | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Andrew Wright | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas David Richardson | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen James Hunneysett | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Liddle | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Bradshaw | Trustee | 22 January 2015 |
|
|||||
EDWARD TWIDDY | Trustee | 21 August 2012 |
|
|||||
RT HON HUGO CHARLES REMNANT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £733.46k | £484.67k | £532.97k | £849.00k | £1.24m | |
|
Total expenditure | £790.02k | £397.52k | £491.34k | £597.63k | £1.21m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £111.87k | £146.25k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £567.64k | £120.08k | £256.58k | £263.28k | £815.79k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £86.04k | N/A | £141.67k | £270.68k | £281.95k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £23.55k | N/A | £48.67k | £82.14k | £42.09k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £617.07k | N/A | £328.35k | £485.99k | £907.53k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £140 | N/A | £57 | £164 | £2.27k | |
|
Income - Other | £6.65k | N/A | £14.22k | £10.03k | £10.87k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £30.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £771.99k | N/A | £460.20k | £537.72k | £1.18m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.43k | N/A | £5.59k | £2.84k | £753 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £4.62k | N/A | £3.76k | £5.10k | £15.21k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £16.60k | N/A | £25.54k | £57.06k | £28.81k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £13.84k | N/A | £5.81k | £7.26k | £8.13k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £137.30k | N/A | £296.46k | £524.93k | £630.62k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £39.24k | N/A | £61.58k | £40.12k | £108.89k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 15 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 15 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 13 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 13 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 MARCH 2004.
Charitable objects
(A) TO CONSERVE, PROTECT, REHABILITATE AND IMPROVE THE RIVERS, STREAMS, WATERCOURSES AND WATER IMPOUNDMENTS OF THE RIVER TYNE CATCHMENT INCLUDING ITS ESTUARY AND ADJACENT COASTAL AREA. (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, OR ANY ASSOCIATION, COMPANY, LOCAL AUTHORITY, ADMINISTRATIVE OR GOVERNMENTAL AGENCY OR PUBLIC BODY OR REPRESENTATIVE BODY IN:- (1) THE UNDERSTANDING OF RIVERS, RIVER CORRIDORS AND CATCHMENTS, INCLUDING THEIR FAUNA, FLORA AND ECONOMIC OR SOCIAL ACTIVITY, AND RIVER CATCHMENT MANAGEMENT. (2) THE NEED FOR, AND BENEFITS OF, CONSERVATION, PROTECTION, REHABILITATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF AQUATIC ENVIRONMENTS.
Area of benefit
THE RIVER TYNE CATCHMENT INCLUDING ITS ESTUARY AND ADJACENT COASTAL AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tyne Rivers Trust
Unit 8 Shawwell Business Centre
Stagshaw Road
CORBRIDGE
NE45 5PE
- Phone:
- 01434636900
- Email:
- info@tyneriverstrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window