Filton Avenue Primary School Enrichment Fund

Charity number: 1107716
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance the education of pupils attending Filton Avenue Junior School, in particular to offer financial support to those pupils whose own family circumstances prevent them from accessing the full range of extra-curricula school activities that are available and in such other charitable ways as determined by the Trustees

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £9
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Bristol City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 January 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FFAJS (Previous name)
  • THE FRIENDS OF FILTON AVENUE JUNIOR SCHOOL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jane Walton Trustee 02 March 2022
BRISTOL EISTEDDFOD ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
BRISTOL AUTISM SUPPORT
Received: On time
Antoniya Abios Trustee 02 March 2022
None on record
Anne Rutherford Trustee 02 March 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £40 £34 £8 £8 £9
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 01 July 2024 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 03 September 2023 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 08 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 March 2022 251 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 08 March 2022 616 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Filton Avenue Primary School
Lockleaze Road
BRISTOL
BS7 9RP
Phone:
01179030302
Website:

No information available