THE VOLUNTEER CENTRE- CHESTERFIELD AND NORTH EAST DERBYSHIRE

Charity number: 1107942
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides a brokerage service for volunteers in Chesterfield and North East Derbyshire helping them to access volunteering opportunities with other organisations or on the VC's own volunteering projects. The Volunteer Centre follows the six core functions of a Volunteer Centre as laid out by Volunteering England.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £162,706
Total expenditure: £135,113

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 February 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kate Sarvent Chair 22 January 2016
None on record
Keith Falconer Trustee 22 September 2023
THE CHESTERFIELD UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
Paul Grinbergs Trustee 22 September 2023
None on record
Georgina Kassim Trustee 22 September 2023
None on record
Lynn Tory Trustee 02 December 2022
None on record
Elizabeth Marsden BEM Trustee 02 December 2022
None on record
Eric Gilson Trustee 02 December 2022
None on record
Diana Ruff Trustee 15 June 2019
None on record
Sharon Edith Rogers Trustee 10 February 2017
None on record
Stephanie Jane Bratt Trustee 18 December 2013
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S, BRAMALL LANE SHEFFIELD
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £142.74k £170.97k £146.82k £134.60k £162.71k
Total expenditure £117.80k £117.80k £128.76k £130.17k £135.11k
Income from government contracts £57.00k £159.46k £117.45k £93.15k N/A
Income from government grants £16.00k £2.30k £28.47k N/A £35.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 13 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 13 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 11 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 11 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 03 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 July 2021 152 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 02 July 2021 152 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Volunteer Centre
38 Knifesmithgate
CHESTERFIELD
S40 1RQ
Phone:
01246276777