SOUTHREPPS COMMONS TRUST

Charity Number: 1108814
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

On behalf of Southrepps Parish Council and Norfolk County Council we look after all of Southrepps Common which is 12.4 hectares of Local Nature Reserve, including a Site of Special Scientific Interest whose management is prescribed by Natural England.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2018

Total income: £1,972
Total expenditure: £1,687

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 April 2005: Standard registration
  • 27 July 2019: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
  • 27 July 2019: Funds transferred to 208734 NORFOLK WILDLIFE TRUST
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2014 30/04/2015 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018
Total gross income £3.61k £1.83k £2.70k £2.14k £1.97k
Total expenditure £2.15k £2.49k £2.98k £4.24k £1.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 16 October 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 14 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 04 April 2017 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required