HOME-START OXFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Home-Start Oxford offers support, friendship, and practical help to families with a child under five, and particularly families who are vulnerable, isolated, under stress, often with complex needs, through home visiting by trained volunteers and other services. The charity's purpose is to help children by supporting parents to grow in confidence and give their children a good start in life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £38,200 from 4 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 16 March 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PRUDENCE DIANA REYNOLDS | Chair | 15 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alison Sutton-Davezac | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Upton | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Johnston | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mariam Iqbal | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Lucy Noble | Trustee | 20 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Bailey Williams | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
LADY CHARLOTTE HARDCASTLE BEATSON | Trustee | 17 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
DOUGLAS KEIR | Trustee | 30 September 2007 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £215.88k | £319.43k | £270.51k | £315.11k | £292.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £191.64k | £218.66k | £230.98k | £305.47k | £309.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £28.39k | £41.05k | £26.90k | £38.20k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 FEBRUARY 2005.
Charitable objects
A) TO SAFEGUARD, PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; B) TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO, OR MALTREATMENT OF, CHILDREN; C) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, POVERTY AND NEED AMONGST CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; D) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BETTER STANDARDS OF CHILD CARE WITHIN THE AREAS OF WEST AND MID-OXFORDSHIRE AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Area of benefit
WEST AND MID OXFORDSHIRE AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Home Start Oxford
26 Kingfisher Green
Oxford
OX4 7BX
- Phone:
- 01865779991
- Email:
- admin@homestartoxford.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window