CHURCHES TOGETHER IN ENGLAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian religion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 09 August 2005: Standard registration
- 26 September 2024: Funds received from 1096060 THE ASSOCIATION OF BUILDING BRIDGES CHURCHES
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rowena Kathryn Loverance | Chair | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Anderson Jeremiah | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Pastor Rasaq Ibrahim | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|||||||
RICHARD MARK BRADBURY | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|||||||
The Very Reverend Alexander Fostiropoulos | Trustee | 19 November 2022 |
|
|||||||
Dr Lisa Adjei | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Madeline Bird | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
Rev Moses Gyimah Owusu-Sekyere | Trustee | 21 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Lurliene Miller | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Rt Rev Paul Joseph Hendricks | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|||||||
Elizabeth Thavamani Joy | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Charles Callan Slipper | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Stephen John Fowler | Trustee | 07 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £406.61k | £416.71k | £416.19k | £467.89k | £451.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £369.08k | £367.57k | £385.95k | £527.20k | £497.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 FEBRUARY 2005.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH GIVEN BELOW, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND ANY OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. THE CHARITY SHALL SEEK (WITHIN ITS GENERAL OBJECTIVES) TO BE A VISIBLE SIGN OF THE CHURCHES' COMMITMENT TO ONE ANOTHER, IN OBEDIENCE TO OUR LORD'S PRAYER "THAT ALL OF THEM MAY BE ONE, FATHER JUST AS YOU ARE IN ME AND I AM IN YOU: MAY THEY ALSO BE IN US SO THAT THE WORLD MAY BELIEVE THAT YOU HAVE SENT ME". (JOHN 17:21) (NEW INTERNATIONAL VERSION.)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN ENGLAND
27 TAVISTOCK SQUARE
LONDON
WC1H 9HH
- Phone:
- 02075298131
- Email:
- office@cte.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window