ROSSENDALE CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of advice to members of the public, especially money advice, benefits available, legal advice and similar topics.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Total income includes £24,188 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lancashire
Governance
- 11 July 2005: Standard registration
- 07 October 2016: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 07 October 2016: Funds transferred to 1110853 CITIZENS ADVICE ROSSENDALE & HYNDBURN LTD
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £235.39k | £240.17k | £270.23k | £227.01k | £302.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £236.31k | £234.13k | £272.75k | £273.68k | £271.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £24.19k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 19 December 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 28 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 10 February 2016 | 10 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 05 December 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 07 December 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 13 December 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 18 December 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 APRIL 2005.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN ROSSENDALE AND SURROUNDING AREAS ('THE AREA OF BENEFIT') BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
ROSSENDALE AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window