THE WOMEN'S HISTORY NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educates the public on the position and influence of women in history and society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 March 2007: Standard registration
- WHN (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Richardson | Chair | 02 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Susan Cohen | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Amanda Perry | Trustee | 02 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.69k | £19.23k | £16.16k | £14.01k | £14.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.80k | £19.43k | £6.31k | £10.72k | £10.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 SEPTEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED 2 SEPTEMBER 2006.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE POSITION AND INFLUENCE OF WOMEN IN SOCIETY IN AN HISTORICAL CONTEXT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRATICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Department of History
Wivenhoe Park
Colchester
Colchester
CO4 3SQ
- Phone:
- 01206 873811
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window