CHELTENHAM JAZZ

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bringing jazz excellence in performance to a local audience by promoting concerts by musicians of national and international standing. These are arranged, generally monthly, at The Everyman Theatre Studio and the Victory Club.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 15 August 2006: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Jenkins | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alice Moody | Trustee | 16 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
KENNETH DAVID SHEATHER | Trustee | 09 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
GILBERT THOMAS EMERY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID WILLIAM BARKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULIA PRICE | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANDREW BROMLEY TURRALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEN SHEATHER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILIP JOHN LEWIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.34k | £25 | £5.55k | £8.64k | £8.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.44k | £417 | £6.02k | £8.36k | £8.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 February 2023 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8 MAY 2006
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN AND ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF LIVE JAZZ AND ASSOCIATED ART FORMS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE CHELTENHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
204 Old Bath Road
Cheltenham
GL53 9EQ
- Phone:
- 07967876173
- Email:
- jazzincheltenham@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window