THE EXEMPLAR TRUST

Charity Number: 1118440
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The objectives of the charity are the relief of poverty amongst persons of the jewish faith in any part of the world, the advance of the jewish religion in any part of the world and the advancement of the education of the public in any part of the world in the knowledge of the jewish history & culture.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024

Total income: £267,353
Total expenditure: £124,081

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 March 2007: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
EDWARD TEITELBAUM Trustee 01 March 2018
CLEARWATERS TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
NATHAN TEITELBAUM Trustee
NESSWALL LIMITED
Received: On time
SARAH IWANIER Trustee
None on record
BRIAN BLAU Trustee
INFINITY CAPITAL TRUST
Received: On time
JUDITH WILK Trustee
INFINITY CAPITAL TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £248.27k £243.82k £264.35k £281.31k £267.35k
Total expenditure £75.20k £79.54k £95.31k £119.60k £124.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 28 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 28 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2023 30 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 30 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2022 28 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 28 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2021 02 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 02 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 26 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 26 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
First Floor Winston House
349 Regents Park Road
LONDON
N3 1DH
Phone:
02034112001
Website:

No information available