FARMLINK EDUCATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1120308
Charity reporting is up to date (58 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity achieves its objectives of advancing the education of school children in the subjects of farming, food production, biodiversity, the rural economy and the study of the environment and ecology, by undertaking a prograqmme of visists to schools by farmers and reciprocal visits by school children to working farms.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £133,863
Total expenditure: £139,633

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Bath And North East Somerset
  • Bristol City
  • Cornwall
  • Devon
  • Dorset
  • North Somerset
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 July 2007: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SIR DAVID JAMES VERNON WILLS BT Chair
THE LANGFORD TRUST FOR ANIMAL HEALTH AND WELFARE
Received: On time
THE ROYAL BATH AND WEST OF ENGLAND SOCIETY
Received: On time
Adrian Carne Trustee 31 August 2016
None on record
Jeanette Read Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
Nicholas Martin Green Trustee 15 January 2013
THE COUNCIL FOR AWARDS OF ROYAL AGRICULTURAL SOCIETIES
Received: On time
THE FARMERS' CLUB CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
John Alvis Trustee
ROTARY CLUB OF WRINGTON VALE TRUST FUND
Received: On time
MARK POOLEY Trustee
None on record
MARY JAMES Trustee
None on record
BRIAN KIRKUP Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £120.65k £154.51k £100.17k £95.71k £133.86k
Total expenditure £134.36k £123.85k £102.97k £112.54k £139.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £14.83k £10.49k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 27 August 2024 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 27 August 2024 58 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 28 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 28 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Apartment 74
The Crescent
Hannover Quay
BRISTOL
BS1 5JP
Phone:
07795467042
Email:
No information available