THE RAINBOW CENTRE FOR CHILDREN

Charity number: 1120461
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Support for children and families affected by life threatening illness and bereavement.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2018

Total income: £107,173
Total expenditure: £86,238

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Bristol City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 August 2007: Standard registration
  • 21 June 2016: Funds received from 293570 THE RAINBOW CENTRE FOR CHILDREN
  • 15 March 2020: Funds transferred to 1175837 GRIEF ENCOUNTER
  • 15 March 2020: Removed (Amalgamated)
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018
Total gross income £217.40k £234.05k £134.43k £101.74k £107.17k
Total expenditure £251.08k £217.07k £201.74k £99.70k £86.24k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2018 13 May 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 13 May 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2017 19 June 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 19 June 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2016 16 October 2017 108 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 16 October 2017 108 days late