ST MARY'S UNIVERSITY, TWICKENHAM

Charity number: 1120192
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Higher Education

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Richmond Upon Thames

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 July 2007: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • ST MARY'S UNIVERSITY COLLEGE,TWICKENHAM (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Financial Conduct Authority
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RT REV CHARLES PHILLIP RICHARD MOTH Chair 16 December 2011
None on record
David James Trustee 01 August 2024
ST MARY'S STUDENTS' UNION
Received: 24 days late
Dr Ann York Trustee 22 November 2023
None on record
Esteban Jurado Traverso Trustee 22 November 2023
None on record
Laura Eve Bryde Trustee 09 August 2023
None on record
Adeola Cynthia Oke Trustee 06 July 2023
None on record
Benedict Pius Marilaan Andradi Trustee 06 July 2023
None on record
Dr Mary Mihovilovic Trustee 19 January 2023
None on record
Professor Dominic Tildesley Trustee 02 December 2021
None on record
Dr Fiona Gatty Trustee 01 November 2021
None on record
Deborah Streatfield Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Paul Barber Trustee 03 March 2021
SAINT WILLIAM OF YORK YOUTH GROUP
Charity reporting is overdue by 195 days
CHRIST'S AND NOTRE DAME COLLEGE, LIVERPOOL
Received: On time
THE CHARTERED COLLEGE OF TEACHING
Received: On time
FORMATIO
Received: On time
THE ECCLESIASTICAL LAW SOCIETY
Received: On time
The Cathedrals Group of Universities
Received: On time
EDMUND PLOWDEN TRUST
Received: On time
THE DON BROOME SCOUT TRUST
Received: On time
Anthony Paul McClaran Trustee 20 April 2020
None on record
David James Brambell Trustee 25 June 2019
None on record
Claire McDonnell Trustee 21 September 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £52.36m £51.28m £52.08m £54.36m £57.65m
Total expenditure £52.56m £52.61m £52.55m £53.93m £57.29m
Income from government contracts £415.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £4.01m N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £568.00k £486.00k £402.00k £691.00k £438.00k
Income - Other trading activities £9.59m £5.49m £1.54m £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £41.77m £43.35m £45.40m £44.83m £47.68m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £20.00k £35.00k £7.00k £36.00k £571.00k
Income - Other £415.00k £1.91m £4.73m £8.80m £8.96m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £52.56m £52.61m £52.13m £53.93m £57.29m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £144.00k £143.00k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £412.00k £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Own use assets £114.35m £111.65m £110.54m £110.43m £110.21m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £11.19m £13.21m £19.19m £21.26m £18.84m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£11.95m -£18.58m -£14.42m -£864.00k -£770.00k
Total liabilities £16.24m £16.51m £20.81m £20.99m £18.09m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 24 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 24 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 30 June 2023 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 30 June 2023 30 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 30 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 30 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 28 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 28 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 28 May 2021 362 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 28 May 2021 362 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Marys University
Waldegrave Road
Twickenham
TW1 4SX
Phone:
02082404267