JOSIE'S DRAGONFLY TRUST

Charity number: 1121768
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We support children and young people with cancer particularly when treatment is non curative.We try to create happy, positive memories at a very difficult time. We supply art&craft boxes to UK children's cancer specialist hospitals.We arrange dragonfly dreams for 3-20yrs/cash gifts to young people 13-20 to have or do something specific in their last weeks or days.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2016

Total income: £297,865
Total expenditure: £223,010

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public. It works with commercial participators with an agreement in place.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 November 2007: Standard registration
  • 07 December 2018: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
  • 07 December 2018: Funds transferred to 1167247 Dragonfly Cancer Trust
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 30/09/2016
Total gross income £128.79k £121.86k £223.18k £162.66k £297.87k
Total expenditure £149.67k £86.08k £168.98k £142.03k £223.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2016 26 July 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 26 July 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2015 29 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 28 January 2016 On Time