REAL LIFE PARENTING (RLP SERVICES) LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Real Life Parenting works with disabled children and young people running a variety of successful and innovative programs including: - Regular after school, play scheme and creche provision designed around the needs of disabled children - An employment programme for disabled young people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Newham
Governance
- 10 December 2007: Standard registration
- 06 November 2015: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 06 November 2015: Funds transferred to 275936 KIDS
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £242.72k | £95.38k | £129.25k | £99.28k | £107.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £249.82k | £101.63k | £159.06k | £119.27k | £106.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 28 November 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 28 November 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 03 September 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 03 September 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 31 July 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 31 July 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/07/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/07/2007 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 29/03/2012
Charitable objects
A TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AMONGST PARENTS, CARERS, THOSE WITH PARENTAL RESPONSIBILITIES AND PROFESSIONALS CONCERNED WITH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE; B TO RELIEVE CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS WHO HAVE A DISABILITY OR IMPAIRMENT, AND THEIR PARENT AND CARERS, IN PARTICULAR BY I THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING AND ADVISORY, COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT SERVICES; II PROMOTING AN INCREASE IN THE RANGE OF EDUCATIONAL AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES AVAILABLE; III THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL RECREATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; C TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION ABOUT CHILDHOOD DISABILITY AND IMPAIRMENT AND THEIR IMPACT ON THE CHILD, SIBLINGS, PARENTS AND OTHER CARERS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window