TARGET OVARIAN CANCER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Over 7,000 women are diagnosed with ovarian cancer each year in the UK, and each day sadly 11 women die from this disease. Target Ovarian Cancer's vision is to stop ovarian cancer from devastating lives. We do this by targeting what's important - symptoms awareness, life-saving early diagnosis, better treatments and support for everyone affected - and we do this across all four nations of the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
Total income:
£4,023,662
Donations and legacies | £4.01m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £12.16k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£4,420,026
Raising funds | £1.16m | |
Charitable activities | £3.26m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £23,150 from 1 government contract(s) and £25,009 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.16m | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.26m |
People

44 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 17 July 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Se Miao Angie Ma | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jo Paice | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Saswati Saha Mitra | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rajesh Bhogaita | Trustee | 06 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sonya Judith Clara Branch | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Margaret Barker MBE | Trustee | 21 February 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.77m | £3.16m | £3.89m | £3.27m | £4.02m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.40m | £3.20m | £3.49m | £3.49m | £4.42m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £23.15k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £88.00k | £25.01k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.77m | £3.16m | £3.89m | £3.27m | £4.01m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £3.32k | £5.97k | £3.01k | £2.53k | £12.16k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £231.54k | £90.43k | £240.20k | £510.50k | £270.99k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.68m | £2.46m | £2.64m | £2.42m | £3.26m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £721.80k | £738.14k | £845.00k | £1.07m | £1.16m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £16.76k | £20.66k | £13.14k | £25.60k | £15.60k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £122.04k | £148.95k | £98.87k | £35.65k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £12.14k | £4.30k | £25.68k | £27.30k | £24.78k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.62m | £1.76m | £2.06m | £1.79m | £1.36m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £373.45k | £533.00k | £450.63k | £408.20k | £370.49k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 01 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 01 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 17 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | 17 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/06/2008 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 29/12/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/11/2013 as amended on 05 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR, AMONG WOMEN WHO HAVE OR ARE AT RISK OF DEVELOPING OVARIAN CANCER OR OTHER GYNAECOLOGICAL DISEASES BY: 3.1 THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES, PREVENTION, DETECTION, TREATMENT AND CURE OF OVARIAN CANCER AND OTHER GYNAECOLOGICAL DISEASES AND THEIR EFFECTS AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH; 3.2 RELIEF OF SUFFERING AMONG WOMEN AFFECTED BY OVARIAN CANCER AND OTHER GYNAECOLOGICAL DISEASES, THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND INFORMATION; AND 3.3 THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ON ISSUES RELATING TO OVARIAN CANCER AND OTHER GYNAECOLOGICAL DISEASES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, SCOTLAND, NORTHERN IRELAND. ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 ANGEL GATE
LONDON
EC1V 2PT
- Phone:
- 02079235470
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window