WYCOMBE HOMELESS CONNECTION CHRISTIAN TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Wycombe Homeless Connection provides a volunteer based night shelter in church halls during January - March with year round support, sign posting, advocacy, mentoring and drop-ins for single homeless people over 18. WHC works closely with the local authority homelessness department, probation service, health care, housing providers and employment sevices enabling guests to rebuild their lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 08 September 2009: Standard registration
- 03 June 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 03 June 2015: Funds transferred to 1156211 WYCOMBE HOMELESS CONNECTION
- WYCOMBE WINTER NIGHT SHELTER CHRISTIAN TRUST (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2010 | 30/04/2011 | 30/04/2012 | 30/04/2013 | 30/04/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.35k | £92.08k | £112.52k | £132.56k | £158.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.67k | £86.73k | £97.11k | £124.98k | £144.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2014 | 09 February 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2014 | 29 January 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2013 | 10 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2013 | 10 January 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2012 | 11 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2012 | 11 January 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 AUGUST 2009 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 20 OCTOBER 2010
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY THE PROVISION OF EMERGENCY AND OTHER ACCOMMODATION, ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE FOR PERSONS IN NEED WHO ARE DEEMED HOMELESS AND REQUIRE SUCH ACCOMMODATION, ADVICE, OR ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window