RIVIERA LIFE LINK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Riviera Life Link exists for the relief of poverty, sickness and distress; the preservation of good health and to advance education for individuals and communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £74,734 from 5 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- 12 July 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK ERIC SLANEY | Chair | 20 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Michael Parrott | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jordan Williams | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Jackie Williams | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.77k | £43.20k | £51.27k | £42.42k | £91.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.68k | £25.34k | £32.69k | £48.00k | £52.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | £17.30k | £6.01k | £21.94k | £74.73k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 JUNE 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 22 JUNE 2010
Charitable objects
4.1. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS BY THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE; 4.2. THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE; 4.3. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE; AND 4.4. FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Home Church
527 Babbacombe Road
Torquay
TQ1 1HG
- Phone:
- 01803291156
- Email:
- info@rivieralife.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window