LEARNING FUTURES (WEST WILTS) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's objects are to provide educational opportunities for children between the ages of 13 to 19 across the West Wiltshire area. In furtherance of these objects the charity operates a range of courses across levels 1,2 and 3 as well as staff training and enrichment activities and trips for students.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 12 May 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FERGUS COLIN STEWART | Chair | 18 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
Alan Henderson | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emma Reynolds | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Denise Lloyd | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID FORSTER | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Paul Skipp | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert Price | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Locke | Trustee | 23 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Lowkis | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £637.90k | £142.56k | £216.25k | £123.80k | £34.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £676.48k | £496.85k | £91.40k | £138.44k | £41.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £99.00k | £9.01k | £198.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £637.90k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £676.48k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £4.60k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 09 October 2024 | 101 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 09 October 2024 | 101 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 09 October 2024 | 467 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 09 October 2024 | 467 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 July 2022 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 21 July 2022 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 04 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 04 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 AUGUST 2008
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF AND OTHERWISE TO SUPPORT YOUNG PEOPLE IN RELATION TO EDUCATIONAL, TRAINING AND WORK OPPORTUNITIES AND THEIR PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT IN RELATION TO SUCH OPPORTUNITIES AND TO RELIEVE ANY NEED AND DISADVANTAGE OF YOUNG PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lavington School
The Spring
Market Lavington
DEVIZES
SN10 4EB
- Phone:
- 07793 253061
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window