BILTON EVANGELICAL CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian Faith. The relief of people who are poor and needy. Education on the basis of Christian principles.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leicestershire
- Northamptonshire
- Warwickshire
- Burkina Faso
- Costa Rica
- Thailand
Governance
- 26 August 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Mason | Chair | 21 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Andrew David Dernie | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Ann Bennett | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Mary Taylor | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Mark Swales | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew David Kilby | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tim RAY | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey William Cotterill | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr Mark Richmond | Trustee | 22 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £462.94k | £426.74k | £450.38k | £396.20k | £375.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £437.74k | £392.33k | £473.91k | £414.54k | £438.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £29.77k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 JUNE 2010 as amended on 30 Oct 2017
Charitable objects
A TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN BILTON, RUGBY AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY B TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT C TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR EDUCATIONAL, RECREATIONAL AND OTHER LEISURETIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN RUGBY AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Area of benefit
BILTON, RUGBY
Contact information
- Address:
-
BILTON EVANGELICAL CHURCH
14 MAIN STREET
BILTON
RUGBY
WARWICKSHIRE
CV22 7NB
- Phone:
- 01788 817326
- Email:
- trustees@becchurch.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window