PRIORY METHODIST CHURCH, BEDFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Priory Methodist Church is a worshipping community and promotes the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

20 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bedford
Governance
- 28 January 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neville Francis Posnett | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Christine Hearn | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Ann Kalyan | Trustee | 02 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER MARY WOOD | Trustee | 02 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Gordon | Trustee | 13 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jasine Belinfante | Trustee | 13 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Michael Giles | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Christopher Sandy | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Julie Gaunt | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Sutherland Brown | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Colin Paul Watts | Trustee | 15 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane McVey | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Keith Michael Gaunt | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Gound | Trustee | 15 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Kathleen Barlow | Trustee | 22 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Lloyd SRN, SCM | Trustee | 12 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Kathy Saw Yean Lewis | Trustee | 01 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
HUBERT TSATSU AMETEFE | Trustee | 28 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
CARMEN ROWE | Trustee | 28 June 2013 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Mary Little | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £128.52k | £104.28k | £124.57k | £177.99k | £139.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £119.54k | £114.87k | £113.71k | £121.85k | £139.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.75k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 15 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the dicipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
PRIORY METHODIST CHURCH
63 NEWNHAM AVENUE
BEDFORD
MK41 9QJ
- Phone:
- 01234353523
- Email:
- office@priorychurch.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window