THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF TRINITY BARKINGSIDE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and bereaved. Promotion of Christianity and individual spiritual growth through sermons, the staging of events and meetings, small groups, and courses. Supporting other charities in the UK and oversees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Redbridge
Governance
- 25 February 2009: Previously excepted registration
- HOLY TRINITY CHURCH, BARKINGSIDE PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Priestman | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Gentry | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Mary Edwards | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Roman | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Harold William Moth | Trustee | 23 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kaye Larbi | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Horton | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hyacinth Osborne | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Stoneham | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Tricia McCarthy | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
MAXINE ELIZABETH PAUL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.05k | £148.20k | £86.04k | £86.96k | £71.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £96.64k | £97.51k | £76.86k | £137.82k | £71.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Parish Office Holy Trinity Church
Mossford Green
Barkingside
ILFORD
IG6 2BX
- Phone:
- 07478187010
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window