THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. EDMUND,ALLESTREE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Parochial Church Council has the responsibility of "co-operating with the incumbent in promoting in the parish the whole mission of the church - pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical".
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £812 from 1 government grant(s)
People

13 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derby City
Governance
- 01 April 2009: Previously excepted registration
- 08 December 2022: Funds received from 503498 PARISH CLERK'S LAND CHARITY, ALLESTREE
- ST. EDMUND'S PCC, ALLESTREE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter John Aspinall | Trustee | 06 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev Rachael Brooks | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANN MILLER | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Madeleine Riou Fullerton | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Andrew Smith | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Anne Mary Jack | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
David John Redfern | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER DAVID JACK | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Matthew John Cooper | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Louise Felicity Margaret Whittaker | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JAMES FLATMAN | Trustee |
|
||||||
GEOFFREY KENNETH BAILEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK ASHLEY HALLIWELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £158.96k | £196.53k | £152.27k | £156.19k | £131.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £135.14k | £187.23k | £140.45k | £149.18k | £136.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £812 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 21 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 21 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Edmund's Church
St Edmund's Close
Allestree
DERBY
--
DE22 2DZ
- Phone:
- 01332 551404
- Email:
- steds.stmatts@outlook.com
- Website:
-
stedsandstmatts.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window