ST JOHN'S METHODIST CHURCH LLANDUDNO

Charity Number: 1128903
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The church is engaged in promoting the mission of the Methodist Church. It fulfills this role through worship, pastoral care and learning, outreach to the local community and wider world, and links with other denominations.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £114,215
Total expenditure: £119,376

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for being a trustee.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Conwy

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 March 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

23 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nigel Rodgers Chair 01 September 2022
None on record
Patricia Preston Trustee 01 June 2019
None on record
Carolyn Styan Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
David Barratt Trustee 01 September 2018
CONWY AND PRESTATYN METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Deacon Janet Smith Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Rita Johnson Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Alan Gordon Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
Marjorie Price Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
Hilda Linda Harper Trustee 01 June 2016
None on record
Margaret Jones Trustee 01 June 2016
None on record
MARY JONES Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
JANET HUGHES Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record
Valerie Conway Trustee 01 June 2014
None on record
John Hollands Trustee 01 June 2014
None on record
LINDA HARPER Trustee 04 June 2013
None on record
VAL CONWAY Trustee 04 June 2013
None on record
CAROLE MORRELL Trustee 04 June 2013
None on record
MICHAEL BENNETT Trustee 26 July 2011
None on record
Graham Tovey Trustee 01 June 2011
None on record
CERI RHIAN SMITH Trustee
None on record
PETER NOEL ACKERLEY Trustee
None on record
EVELYN ELIZABETH CONWAY BROWN Trustee
None on record
SARAH ANN MARY SMALL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £211.07k £130.64k £77.97k £135.04k £114.22k
Total expenditure £199.73k £225.93k £78.82k £88.41k £119.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 09 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 09 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 20 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 20 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 31 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 31 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 20 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 20 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 19 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 19 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Johns Methodist Church
53-55 Mostyn Street
LLANDUDNO
LL30 2NN
Phone:
01492860439