THE HERITAGE STEAMBOAT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support for The Tamesis Trust. Work on digitising the Steam Boat Association collection of archive photos and drawings. Raise funds to support historic steamboat conservation work Help train and educate people in the skills needed for operating steam launch machinery Educate people about the history of steam launches
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 20 May 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 May 2009: Standard registration
- SBA TRUST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN Watson SMITH | Chair |
|
||||||
Dorothy Ann Bullough | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
CAPTAIN ADRIAN BIRTLES | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MIKE BELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN HILLSDON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD HAVARD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 20/05/2020 | 20/05/2021 | 20/05/2022 | 20/05/2023 | 20/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £173 | £233 | £322 | £278 | £100 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 20 May 2024 | 02 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 20 May 2023 | 13 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 20 May 2022 | 25 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 20 May 2021 | 13 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 20 May 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED 13 JANUARY 2007
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE NATION BY PROMOTING: - A) THE RESTORATION, PRESERVATION AND OPERATION (WHERE PRACTICAL), OF ALL FORMS OF SMALL HISTORIC STEAM CRAFT, TO SHOW TO THE PUBLIC THE HISTORICAL EVOLUTION AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE FIRST USES OF MECHANICAL POWER IN SMALL BOATS. B) THE PRESERVATION OF BOOKS, DRAWINGS, RECORDS, PHOTOS, FILMS, AND ANY ARTEFACTS RELATING TO STEAM BOATS. C) THE TRAINING IN THE TRADITIONAL SKILLS REQUIRED FOR BUILDING, MAINTAINING AND OPERATING SMALL STEAM POWERED VESSELS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 MILLBANK
KINTBURY
HUNGERFORD
RG17 9UW
- Phone:
- 01488658795
- Email:
- brian.smith@consuta.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window