The Parochial Church Council of the Ecclesiastical Parish of Bridlington Christ Church with Bessingby and Ulrome

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CHURCH OF ENGLAND PARISH CHURCH
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

17 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 16 July 2009: Previously excepted registration
- CHRIST CHURCH BRIDLINGTON PCC (Working name)
- THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH BRIDLINGTON QUAY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev MARK JONATHAN CAREY | Chair | 09 November 2017 |
|
|||||
ANDREW WATTS | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mary Elizabeth Harwood Coates | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Margarita Sarah Robson | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Elizabeth Reid | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Samuels | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Carmichael | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Walker | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Miles | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary Corkish | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP GOWLAND | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Middleton | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Gradwell | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANTHONY JOHN CLARKE | Trustee | 13 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Penelope Clarke | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jeniffer Williams | Trustee | 15 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHAZ WALKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £298.41k | £303.53k | £27.15k | £299.99k | £308.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £256.11k | £333.08k | £377.45k | £266.13k | £283.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES as amended on 26 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Christ Church
2 Quay Road
Bridlington
YO15 2AP
- Phone:
- 01262404100
- Email:
- office@ccbn.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window